Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Reimesch Koefoed | 20.04.1993 | 29.11.1993 | direktion |
Dimitre Vassilev Popov | 19.07.1985 | 03.06.1994 | direktion |
Bjørn Stiedl | 19.07.1985 | 20.04.1993 | direktion |
Hans Jørgen Samuelsen | 19.07.1985 | 16.12.1992 | direktion |
Ernst Norup Olesen | 19.07.1985 | 23.09.1992 | direktion |
Thomas Christian Jensen | 19.07.1985 | 24.08.1992 | direktion |