Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Jacob Clausen | 15.04.1985 | 19.11.2001 | direktion |
Peter Johansen | 15.04.1985 | 04.12.1987 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Jacob Clausen | 15.04.1985 | 19.11.2001 | bestyrelse |
Kamlesh Shantilal Parikh | 15.04.1985 | 19.11.2001 | bestyrelse |
Anna Sophie Andrea Clausen | 15.04.1985 | 17.10.2000 | formand |
Børge Ingemann Akselbo Kroer | 15.04.1985 | 02.03.1993 | bestyrelse |
Peter Johansen | 15.04.1985 | 04.12.1987 | bestyrelse |