Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Nielsen | 12.12.1984 | 31.10.1996 | direktion |
Marianne Tess Hougaard | 12.12.1984 | 22.04.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Niels Alva-Jørgensen | 12.12.1984 | 31.10.1996 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Kjældgaard | 12.12.1984 | 31.10.1996 | bestyrelse |
Preben Svend Qvist-Sørensen | 12.12.1984 | 31.10.1996 | bestyrelse |
Bent Aage Petersen | 12.12.1984 | 15.06.1994 | bestyrelse |
Peter Olaf Nissen Larson | 12.12.1984 | 15.06.1994 | bestyrelse |
Philip Baruch | 12.12.1984 | 22.04.1993 | bestyrelse |
Marianne Tess Hougaard | 12.12.1984 | 22.04.1993 | bestyrelse |
Søren Hougaard | 12.12.1984 | 22.04.1993 | bestyrelse |