Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Leif Hansen | 15.05.1985 | 13.05.1993 | direktion |
John Andersen | 15.05.1985 | 02.11.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Leif Hansen | 15.05.1985 | 13.05.1993 | bestyrelse |
Troels Petersen | 15.05.1985 | 13.05.1993 | bestyrelse |
Rene Bracker | 15.05.1985 | 13.05.1993 | bestyrelse |
John Andersen | 15.05.1985 | 02.11.1992 | bestyrelse |
Arne Ruskjær | 15.05.1985 | 02.11.1992 | bestyrelse |
Erik Sherman Dyeremose | 15.05.1985 | 02.11.1992 | bestyrelse |
Ernst Dyeremose | 15.05.1985 | 31.01.1991 | bestyrelse |