Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ove Rindbo | 15.02.1985 | 30.08.1996 | direktion |
Marcus Allan Steen Donsmark | 15.02.1985 | 01.08.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ove Rindbo | 15.02.1985 | 30.08.1996 | bestyrelse |
Kjeld Erik Hjortshøj | 15.02.1985 | 30.08.1996 | bestyrelse |
Bende Rindbo | 15.02.1985 | 30.08.1996 | bestyrelse |
Grethe Rindbo | 15.02.1985 | 23.07.1992 | bestyrelse |
Curt Henry Appelgren | 15.02.1985 | 31.01.1991 | bestyrelse |
Wilhelm Peder Gustaf Dyrssen | 15.02.1985 | 31.01.1991 | bestyrelse |
Marcus Allan Steen Donsmark | 15.02.1985 | 01.08.1990 | bestyrelse |
Merete Holm | 15.02.1985 | 01.08.1990 | bestyrelse |
Lars Gunnar Gustafsson | 15.02.1985 | 01.08.1990 | bestyrelse |
Jan Gustav Smith | 15.02.1985 | 28.08.1989 | bestyrelse |
Leif Carl Gustav Smith | 15.02.1985 | 28.08.1989 | bestyrelse |