Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Niels Berg | 01.07.1984 | 03.09.1992 | direktion |
Peter Lasse Budtz | 01.07.1984 | 13.07.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Oluf Christian Engell | 01.07.1984 | 03.09.1992 | bestyrelse |
Nils Lemming | 01.07.1984 | 03.09.1992 | bestyrelse |
Sten Erik Magnus | 01.07.1984 | 03.09.1992 | bestyrelse |
Helge Kvam | 01.07.1984 | 29.08.1991 | bestyrelse |
Niels Johan Molstad | 01.07.1984 | 24.10.1990 | bestyrelse |
Gustav Heiberg Simonsen | 01.07.1984 | 12.10.1988 | bestyrelse |
Peter Lasse Budtz | 01.07.1984 | 21.08.1987 | bestyrelse |
Torbjørn Nåvli | 01.07.1984 | 21.08.1987 | bestyrelse |