Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Inge Pind | 18.10.1999 | 31.05.2007 | direktion |
Hans Ryge Schultzer | 15.04.1983 | 18.10.1999 | direktion |
Niels Pind | 15.04.1983 | 26.10.1987 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Inge Pind | 18.10.1999 | 31.05.2007 | bestyrelse |
Niels Pind | 15.04.1983 | 31.05.2007 | bestyrelse |
Goran Isak Elof Bergholtz | 15.04.1983 | 31.05.2007 | formand |
Hans Ryge Schultzer | 15.04.1983 | 18.10.1999 | bestyrelse |
Bent Boris Kristensen | 15.04.1983 | 17.02.1995 | bestyrelse |
Niels Pind | 15.04.1983 | 26.10.1987 | bestyrelse |