Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jytte Holst | 22.06.2004 | 24.04.2006 | direktion |
Ib Gudmund Sørensen | 16.06.2004 | 22.06.2004 | direktion |
Arno Hansen Bech | 02.03.2004 | 16.06.2004 | direktion |
Annette Klausen | 14.02.2001 | 02.03.2004 | adm. dir |
Mogens Wisti Kiilerich | 07.02.2001 | 14.02.2001 | adm. dir |
Annette Klausen | 20.03.2000 | 07.02.2001 | direktion |
Ib Gudmund Sørensen | 25.11.1999 | 20.03.2000 | direktion |
Jørgen Marsted-Mortensen | 20.04.1998 | 25.11.1999 | direktion |
Michael Seifert | 03.07.1984 | 04.09.1997 | direktion |
Carina Juul | 03.07.1984 | 19.01.1995 | direktion |
Bodil Merete Jørgensen | 03.07.1984 | 11.02.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Willumsen | 20.04.1998 | 25.11.1999 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Marsted-Mortensen | 20.04.1998 | 25.11.1999 | bestyrelse |
Michael Seifert | 20.04.1998 | 25.11.1999 | formand |
Jan Willumsen | 03.07.1984 | 02.01.1998 | bestyrelse |
Erik Johannes Thomsen | 03.07.1984 | 20.10.1997 | formand |
Michael Seifert | 03.07.1984 | 04.09.1997 | bestyrelse |
Jens Erik Larsen | 03.07.1984 | 19.01.1995 | bestyrelse |
Carina Juul | 03.07.1984 | 19.01.1995 | bestyrelse |