Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Asger Schelde Jensby | 01.09.1985 | 23.02.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Benny Ibbo Munch | 01.09.1985 | 12.06.1996 | bestyrelse |
Asger Schelde Jensby | 01.09.1985 | 23.02.1988 | bestyrelse |
Henning Korsbæk Frandsen | 01.09.1985 | 23.02.1988 | formand |
Klaus Kiilerich-Hansen | 01.09.1985 | 11.12.1987 | bestyrelse |
Niels Erik Nielsen | 01.09.1985 | 11.12.1987 | bestyrelse |