Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Holger Warrer | 16.11.2000 | 11.02.2015 | direktion |
Holger Warrer | 25.06.1974 | 16.11.2000 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Holger Warrer | 25.06.1974 | 11.02.2015 | bestyrelse |
Knud Warrer | 25.06.1974 | 11.02.2015 | bestyrelse |
Hans Mariendal Esrup | 25.06.1974 | 16.11.2000 | bestyrelse |
Inger Kirstine Schou | 25.06.1974 | 25.02.1991 | bestyrelse |
Jan Herrig | 25.06.1974 | 06.05.1988 | bestyrelse |
Steen Nordahl Møller | 25.06.1974 | 06.05.1988 | bestyrelse |