Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Leif Nygaard Dircksen | 13.03.1996 | 01.04.2011 | adm. dir |
Flemming Axel Zeuthen Bruun | 13.09.1976 | 27.09.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Leif Nygaard Dircksen | 23.09.2009 | 01.04.2011 | bestyrelse |
Allan Thiim | 06.06.2006 | 01.04.2011 | bestyrelse |
Karen Lisbeth Bakkestrøm | 06.06.2006 | 01.04.2011 | personlig_suppleant |
Ulf Christer Fridlund | 24.04.2006 | 01.04.2011 | næstformand |
Ulf Christer Fridlund | 23.03.2006 | 24.04.2006 | næstformand |
Jørgen Erik Holst | 30.09.2005 | 01.04.2011 | formand |
Bengt Isberg | 30.09.2005 | 23.09.2009 | bestyrelse |
Peter Kjær | 23.03.2004 | 30.09.2005 | bestyrelse |
Christian Thorkild Jensen | 18.03.2002 | 01.04.2011 | personlig_suppleant |
Carsten Vork Jensen | 18.03.2002 | 06.06.2006 | bestyrelse |
Søren Jakobsen | 18.03.2002 | 30.09.2005 | bestyrelse |
Erik Lodberg | 12.10.1998 | 30.09.2005 | bestyrelse |
Per Frank | 12.10.1998 | 23.03.2004 | formand |
Peter Kjær | 12.10.1998 | 18.03.2002 | bestyrelse |
Leif Nygaard Dircksen | 13.03.1996 | 12.10.1998 | bestyrelse |
Leif Broch | 13.09.1976 | 01.04.2011 | bestyrelse |
Alice Langmach | 13.09.1976 | 18.03.2002 | bestyrelse |
Bent Thuesen Madsen | 13.09.1976 | 18.03.2002 | personlig_suppleant |
Anne Juul Pedersen | 13.09.1976 | 18.03.2002 | personlig_suppleant |
Bent Nielsen | 13.09.1976 | 31.12.1999 | formand |
Erling Sørensen Lindahl | 13.09.1976 | 12.10.1998 | bestyrelse |
Egon Andersen | 13.09.1976 | 13.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Jens Carl Vestergaard | 13.09.1976 | 26.02.1992 | bestyrelse |
Peter Kruse | 13.09.1976 | 06.02.1991 | bestyrelse |
Robert Henriksen | 13.09.1976 | 06.02.1991 | bestyrelse |
Erik Dalgaard Hansen | 13.09.1976 | 06.02.1991 | bestyrelse |
Anders Hallen Pedersen | 13.09.1976 | 06.02.1991 | formand |
Preben Høy | 13.09.1976 | 02.07.1990 | bestyrelse |
Jens Carl Vestergaard | 13.09.1976 | 02.07.1990 | bestyrelse |
Claus Steen Hansen | 13.09.1976 | 28.06.1989 | bestyrelse |
Jens Abildtrup | 13.09.1976 | 27.09.1988 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Axel Zeuthen Bruun | 13.09.1976 | 27.09.1988 | bestyrelse |
Elin Bruun | 13.09.1976 | 27.09.1988 | bestyrelse |