Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Moses Malone Isazi | 11.11.2019 | 04.12.2019 | direktør |
Lasse Falandysz Hald | 04.11.2019 | 11.11.2019 | direktør |
Angelina Naghizadeh | 10.10.2018 | 04.11.2019 | direktør |
Rona Naghizadeh | 04.04.2017 | 10.10.2018 | direktør |
Firuz Naghizadeh | 04.04.2017 | 31.05.2018 | adm. dir |