Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Rahmi Secilmis | 02.04.2019 | 09.09.2022 | adm. dir |
Jamie Martin Skriver | 23.07.2018 | 02.04.2019 | adm. dir |
Ajmal Safi | 28.11.2017 | 23.07.2018 | adm. dir |
Delal Savran | 25.10.2017 | 28.11.2017 | adm. dir |
Rahmi Secilmis | 19.12.2016 | 25.10.2017 | adm. dir |