Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Warren Richmond | 16.08.2017 | 10.12.2020 | direktør |
James Keleher | 16.08.2017 | 07.06.2018 | direktør |
Sven Erik Gustav Brorhed | 21.10.2016 | 16.08.2017 | direktør |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Warren Richmond | 21.10.2016 | 16.08.2017 | formand |
James Keleher | 21.10.2016 | 16.08.2017 | suppleant |