Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Claus Bjørn | 01.10.2018 | 29.01.2024 | adm. dir |
Mark Urban | 13.01.2017 | 01.10.2018 | adm. dir |
Thomas Bruun Hansen | 13.01.2017 | 01.10.2018 | direktør |
Peter Sørensen | 21.12.2015 | 13.01.2017 | direktør |
Henning Holm-Pedersen | 21.12.2015 | 13.01.2017 | direktør |