Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Vestergaard Andersen | 29.03.1996 | 30.05.1997 | direktion |
Thomas Hau Knudsen | 21.12.1976 | 01.04.1996 | adm. dir |
Gert Lohmann | 21.12.1976 | 15.09.1995 | adm. dir |
Ib Erthmann Frølich | 21.12.1976 | 17.06.1993 | adm. dir |
Svend Erik Drustrup | 21.12.1976 | 04.10.1988 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Vestergaard Andersen | 29.03.1996 | 30.05.1997 | bestyrelse |
Harald Guldahl | 29.03.1996 | 30.05.1997 | bestyrelse |
Frode Sjursen | 29.03.1996 | 30.05.1997 | formand |
Lars Anthon Worsøe-Petersen | 21.12.1976 | 29.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Erling Knattrup | 21.12.1976 | 29.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Hans Emanuel Linnarsson | 21.12.1976 | 29.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Ib Erthmann Frølich | 21.12.1976 | 29.03.1996 | formand |
Gert Lohmann | 21.12.1976 | 15.09.1995 | bestyrelse |
Gunnar Bark | 21.12.1976 | 06.09.1994 | bestyrelse |
Erling Knattrup | 21.12.1976 | 17.06.1993 | bestyrelse |
Niels-Erik Ingemar Danielsson | 21.12.1976 | 17.06.1993 | bestyrelse |
Torben Mortensen | 21.12.1976 | 11.07.1991 | bestyrelse |
Sture Einar Eugen Mansen | 21.12.1976 | 08.06.1989 | bestyrelse |