Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørn Neugebauer Jensen | 03.01.2006 | 18.03.2010 | direktion |
Jørn Neugebauer Jensen | 20.04.1970 | 30.11.2005 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørn Neugebauer Jensen | 03.01.2006 | 18.03.2010 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Jensen | 03.01.2006 | 18.03.2010 | bestyrelse |
Pernille Neugebauer Jensen | 03.01.2006 | 18.03.2010 | formand |
Jens Vestberg | 06.09.2000 | 31.12.2003 | bestyrelse |
Ole Faurschou Schmidt | 16.04.1998 | 30.11.2005 | bestyrelse |
Børge Jacob Jensen | 20.04.1970 | 30.11.2005 | bestyrelse |
Jørn Neugebauer Jensen | 20.04.1970 | 30.11.2005 | bestyrelse |
Geert Neugebauer Jensen | 20.04.1970 | 30.11.2005 | formand |
Anders Georg Jensen | 20.04.1970 | 06.03.1992 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Malby | 20.04.1970 | 11.05.1989 | bestyrelse |