Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Phillip Comerford | 15.01.2019 | 20.05.2019 | adm. dir |
Lars Phillip Comerford | 22.01.2015 | 14.01.2019 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Phillip Comerford | 15.01.2019 | 20.05.2019 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Claus Georg Johansson | 15.01.2019 | 20.05.2019 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Roman Savin | 15.01.2019 | 20.05.2019 | formand |