Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Birgitte Krogsgaard Danø | 22.10.2001 | 08.11.2005 | direktion |
Birgitte Krogsgaard | 29.12.1971 | 22.10.2001 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Soon Kristine Clausen | 16.10.2001 | 08.11.2005 | bestyrelse |
Birgitte Krogsgaard Danø | 16.10.2001 | 08.11.2005 | bestyrelse |
Gorm Danø | 16.10.2001 | 08.11.2005 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Schjerning Lundsgaard | 29.12.1971 | 16.10.2001 | bestyrelse |
Grethe Møller | 29.12.1971 | 16.10.2001 | bestyrelse |
Kirsten Damgaard Lee | 29.12.1971 | 16.10.2001 | bestyrelse |
Steen Bechgaard Danø | 29.12.1971 | 01.01.1998 | bestyrelse |