Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henning Paepke Knudsen | 10.01.2014 | 20.10.2015 | adm. dir |
Brian Andersen | 19.05.2013 | 10.01.2014 | adm. dir |
Selcuk Senoglu | 21.03.2013 | 19.05.2013 | adm. dir |
Serpil Genc | 26.11.2012 | 21.03.2013 | direktion |
Yasar Genc | 19.11.2012 | 26.11.2012 | direktion |