Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Gitte Skovshoved | 07.04.2010 | 18.02.2016 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Rasmus Pihl Skousen | 10.12.2014 | 18.02.2016 | bestyrelse |
Anders Henrig Dethlefsen | 10.12.2014 | 18.02.2016 | formand |
Gitte Skovshoved | 12.02.2014 | 18.02.2016 | bestyrelse |
Peder Vester Henriksen | 07.04.2010 | 10.12.2014 | bestyrelse |
Lars Bo Christoffersen | 07.04.2010 | 10.12.2014 | bestyrelse |
Britta Larsen | 07.04.2010 | 12.02.2014 | bestyrelse |