Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Johnny Jørgensen | 20.06.2009 | 04.01.2017 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Johnny Jørgensen | 20.03.2015 | 04.01.2017 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Villy Jørgensen | 20.03.2015 | 04.01.2017 | formand |
Ellen Paula Jørgensen | 02.02.2011 | 04.01.2017 | bestyrelse |
Joachim Martin Ørum Petersen | 02.02.2011 | 20.03.2015 | formand |
Villy Jørgensen | 02.02.2011 | 19.03.2015 | bestyrelse |