Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Karsten Wettendorff Larsen | 02.04.2014 | 15.01.2015 | direktion |
Heidi Mariane Poulsen | 03.12.2013 | 03.12.2013 | direktion |
Klaus Garde Nielsen | 15.10.2013 | 03.12.2013 | direktion |
Michael Gammeltoft-Hansen | 01.06.2013 | 03.07.2013 | direktion |
Louise Angela Sørensen Winther | 07.06.2011 | 05.07.2013 | direktion |
Poul Holmgård | 24.11.2010 | 07.06.2011 | direktion |
Jacob Peter Thomsen | 13.10.2010 | 24.11.2010 | direktion |
Klaus Garde Nielsen | 05.10.2010 | 24.11.2010 | direktion |
Jacob Peter Thomsen | 30.04.2009 | 05.10.2010 | direktion |