Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Fossum Bladt | 22.03.2016 | 22.07.2020 | adm. dir |
Jens Heimburger | 25.03.2009 | 22.03.2016 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Busch | 22.03.2016 | 22.07.2020 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Jens Heimburger | 22.03.2016 | 22.07.2020 | formand |
Morten Strømsted | 22.03.2016 | 30.01.2018 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Jesper Steen Tastesen | 23.12.2010 | 22.07.2020 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Busch | 23.12.2010 | 21.03.2016 | formand |
Jens Heimburger | 25.03.2009 | 21.03.2016 | bestyrelse |
Lars Fossum Bladt | 25.03.2009 | 23.12.2010 | formand |
Peter von der Hude | 25.03.2009 | 31.05.2010 | bestyrelse |