Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Joanna Mirholm | 27.08.2012 | 19.11.2013 | direktion |
Peter Martedal | 01.01.2010 | 27.08.2012 | direktion |
Elisabeth Fog Schultz | 12.08.2009 | 08.12.2009 | direktion |
Morten Bille | 27.05.2008 | 12.08.2009 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Joanna Mirholm | 01.10.2012 | 12.06.2013 | bestyrelse |
Adam Ringer | 15.09.2009 | 12.06.2013 | bestyrelse |
Milena Anna Lederman | 15.09.2009 | 12.06.2013 | bestyrelse |
Krzysztof Soltyk | 15.09.2009 | 01.10.2012 | bestyrelse |
Jakob Ratz | 27.05.2008 | 15.09.2009 | formand |