Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kim Pihl Hansen | 01.07.2013 | 13.04.2021 | adm. dir |
Torkild Hofman | 07.02.2008 | 01.07.2013 | direktør |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kim Pihl Hansen | 01.09.2008 | 08.03.2021 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Paul Bjerring | 01.09.2008 | 30.06.2020 | formand |
Torkild Hofman | 01.09.2008 | 01.07.2013 | bestyrelsesmedlem |