Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Frank Mejborg Eliasson | 13.11.2007 | 30.06.2009 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Steen Vestrup | 13.11.2007 | 10.08.2010 | bestyrelse |
Jan Frank Mejborg Eliasson | 13.11.2007 | 30.06.2009 | bestyrelse |
Torben Thomasen | 13.11.2007 | 28.10.2008 | formand |