Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ulrik Holsted-Sandgreen | 12.01.2010 | 03.02.2010 | direktion |
Christian Balieu Betting | 28.11.2007 | 12.01.2010 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Christian Hesse Rasmussen | 12.01.2010 | 03.02.2010 | bestyrelse |
Ulrik Holsted-Sandgreen | 12.01.2010 | 03.02.2010 | bestyrelse |
Anne Birgitte de Jonquières Gammeljord | 12.01.2010 | 03.02.2010 | formand |
Gitte Kirk-Thomsen | 06.11.2009 | 12.01.2010 | bestyrelse |
Christian Balieu Betting | 28.11.2007 | 12.01.2010 | bestyrelse |
Dorthe Camilla Anette Rahbek Betting | 28.11.2007 | 12.01.2010 | bestyrelse |
Antony Ashton | 28.11.2007 | 04.11.2009 | bestyrelse |