Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Steen Gude | 15.04.2008 | 14.08.2009 | direktion |
Brian Søholt Petersen | 05.10.2007 | 15.04.2008 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Julius Jensen | 15.04.2008 | 14.08.2009 | formand |
Lars Geister | 15.04.2008 | 01.10.2008 | bestyrelse |
Steen Gude | 05.10.2007 | 14.08.2009 | bestyrelse |
Mads Roikjer | 05.10.2007 | 15.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Steen Bryde | 05.10.2007 | 15.04.2008 | formand |