Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Rasmus Drønen Haugland | 24.06.2011 | 14.05.2024 | adm. dir |
Peter Vinther Hansen | 23.10.2007 | 24.06.2011 | direktør |
Caroline Sundorph Pontoppidan | 03.10.2007 | 23.10.2007 | direktør |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Rasmus Drønen Haugland | 24.06.2011 | 14.05.2024 | formand |
Terje Jensen | 18.05.2010 | 24.06.2011 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Johannes Lunde | 18.05.2010 | 24.06.2011 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
David Ersdal | 18.05.2010 | 24.06.2011 | formand |
Steinar Haugseng | 23.10.2007 | 18.05.2010 | bestyrelsesmedlem |