Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Jørgensen | 03.09.2007 | 19.10.2015 | direktion |
Michael Søren Falck-Jensen | 03.09.2007 | 01.05.2015 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Jørgensen | 03.09.2007 | 19.10.2015 | formand |
Michael Søren Falck-Jensen | 03.09.2007 | 01.05.2015 | bestyrelse |
Birgitte Terese Falck-Jensen | 03.09.2007 | 01.05.2015 | bestyrelse |
Gitti Andersen | 03.09.2007 | 31.05.2014 | bestyrelse |