Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Hoffmann | 20.12.2013 | 01.10.2014 | direktion |
Brian Michael Hansen Overmark Randrup | 13.10.2006 | 20.12.2013 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bo Boulund Knudsen | 20.12.2013 | 01.10.2014 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Hoffmann | 31.05.2010 | 01.10.2014 | bestyrelse |
Mads Danielsen | 31.05.2010 | 20.12.2013 | bestyrelse |
Kurt Poulsen | 13.10.2006 | 01.10.2014 | formand |
Henry Toudal | 13.10.2006 | 31.05.2010 | bestyrelse |
Preben Madsen | 13.10.2006 | 31.05.2010 | bestyrelse |