Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Nyberg | 25.05.2011 | 31.12.2012 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Busch | 25.05.2011 | 31.12.2012 | bestyrelse |
Sven Rosenmeyer Paulsen | 25.05.2011 | 31.12.2012 | formand |
Inge Nilsson | 29.01.2009 | 25.05.2011 | bestyrelse |
Michael Lexner | 23.08.2007 | 25.05.2011 | bestyrelse |
Lars Vang Christensen | 23.08.2007 | 25.02.2010 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Michael Berger | 23.08.2007 | 29.01.2009 | formand |
Christian Stig Møller | 05.12.2006 | 23.08.2007 | bestyrelse |
Søren Michael Damgaard Truelsen | 30.10.2006 | 23.08.2007 | bestyrelse |
Svend Erik Nielsen | 30.10.2006 | 05.12.2006 | bestyrelse |