Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kim Erling Sandvold | 12.06.2006 | 01.09.2010 | direktion |
Jens Peder Bach Jensen | 12.06.2006 | 01.07.2007 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kim Erling Sandvold | 12.06.2006 | 14.03.2008 | bestyrelse |
Lis Rygaard | 12.06.2006 | 14.03.2008 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Ellegaard Jensen | 12.06.2006 | 01.07.2007 | bestyrelse |
Jens Peder Bach Jensen | 12.06.2006 | 24.06.2007 | bestyrelse |