Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Juul Dollerup Sørensen | 01.02.2010 | 27.02.2013 | direktion |
Mads Kristoffer Storgaard Mehlsen | 23.10.2008 | 29.03.2010 | direktion |
Jens Højgaard | 09.01.2008 | 01.02.2010 | adm. dir |
Niels Peter Pretzmann | 03.04.2007 | 09.01.2008 | adm. dir |
Carsten Bo Pedersen | 15.05.2006 | 03.04.2007 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mona Sloth Nielsen | 16.11.2011 | 27.02.2013 | bestyrelse |
Jens Juul Dollerup Sørensen | 29.03.2010 | 27.02.2013 | bestyrelse |
Mads Kristoffer Storgaard Mehlsen | 29.03.2010 | 27.02.2013 | formand |
Jørn Korsgaard Sørensen | 23.10.2008 | 16.11.2011 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Nyby | 23.10.2008 | 16.11.2011 | bestyrelse |
Niels Peter Pretzmann | 09.01.2008 | 29.03.2010 | formand |
Mads Kristoffer Storgaard Mehlsen | 09.01.2008 | 23.10.2008 | bestyrelse |
Finn Pedersen | 09.01.2008 | 23.10.2008 | bestyrelse |
Benny Møller | 03.04.2007 | 09.01.2008 | bestyrelse |
Sven Gunnar Schough | 03.04.2007 | 09.01.2008 | bestyrelse |
Egon Korsbæk | 03.04.2007 | 09.01.2008 | formand |
Peter Leschly | 03.04.2007 | 09.01.2008 | næstformand |
Carl Peter Hugo Hildebrand Welin | 15.05.2006 | 09.01.2008 | bestyrelse |
Hans Christian Esbensen | 15.05.2006 | 03.04.2007 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Bo Pedersen | 15.05.2006 | 03.04.2007 | bestyrelse |
Niels Peter Pretzmann | 15.05.2006 | 03.04.2007 | formand |