Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Abdul Wahab Butt | 02.03.2005 | 26.01.2016 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.01.2005 | 02.03.2005 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lareb Ahmad Butt | 03.06.2013 | 26.01.2016 | bestyrelse |
Tariq Mahmood Butt | 03.06.2013 | 26.01.2016 | bestyrelse |
Feroza Butt | 03.06.2013 | 26.01.2016 | bestyrelse |
Kashif Mahmood Butt | 02.03.2005 | 03.06.2013 | bestyrelse |