Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Frederiksen | 19.04.2013 | 28.09.2019 | direktion |
Brian Moe Hillersdal | 21.12.2004 | 25.08.2009 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Annie Frederiksen | 21.12.2004 | 28.09.2019 | bestyrelse |
Per Frederiksen | 21.12.2004 | 28.09.2019 | formand |
Brian Moe Hillersdal | 21.12.2004 | 25.08.2009 | bestyrelse |