Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Klaus Thorsten Wollesen Lund | 02.02.2007 | 08.10.2009 | bestyrelse |
Torben Holger Schultz | 31.08.2006 | 10.07.2009 | bestyrelse |
Niels Kristian Thygesen | 31.08.2006 | 02.02.2007 | bestyrelse |
Mette Vagner Johannesen | 14.11.2005 | 31.08.2006 | bestyrelse |
Jan Mølhave Pedersen | 14.11.2005 | 31.08.2006 | formand |
Jens Winther | 19.11.2004 | 14.11.2005 | formand |