Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Kalmer Svensk Meyer | 08.03.2004 | 11.10.2004 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.01.2004 | 08.03.2004 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Dan Børge Larsen | 11.10.2004 | 21.11.2006 | bestyrelse |
Jan Bruun Jørgensen | 11.10.2004 | 21.11.2006 | bestyrelse |
Anne Mølgaard Jensen | 11.10.2004 | 21.11.2006 | formand |
Henrik Kalmer Svensk Meyer | 08.03.2004 | 11.10.2004 | bestyrelse |
Niels Bundgaard Pedersen | 08.03.2004 | 11.10.2004 | bestyrelse |
Bo Henrik Becher | 08.03.2004 | 08.03.2004 | formand |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.01.2004 | 08.03.2004 | bestyrelse |
Sebastian Benjamin Bahn Christoffersen | 01.01.2004 | 08.03.2004 | bestyrelse |
Helen Mimi Janniche | 01.01.2004 | 08.03.2004 | bestyrelse |