Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bo Knold Kristensen | 02.02.2004 | 08.10.2007 | direktion |
Christian Philip Levin | 02.02.2004 | 08.10.2004 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Søren Villumsen | 29.12.2005 | 08.10.2007 | bestyrelse |
Bo Knold Kristensen | 02.02.2004 | 08.10.2007 | bestyrelse |
Per Leopold Møller | 02.02.2004 | 08.10.2007 | formand |
Christian Philip Levin | 02.02.2004 | 29.12.2005 | bestyrelse |
Søren Villumsen | 02.02.2004 | 08.10.2004 | bestyrelse |
Peter Leon Levin | 02.02.2004 | 08.10.2004 | bestyrelse |