Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bo Elver Jørgensen | 20.10.2005 | 16.02.2007 | bestyrelse |
Bo Vestergaard Hansen | 20.10.2005 | 16.02.2007 | bestyrelse |
Kai Juul | 28.10.2004 | 20.10.2005 | bestyrelse |
Peter Svarre Jacobsen | 28.10.2004 | 20.10.2005 | bestyrelse |
Peter Schäfer | 01.01.2004 | 28.10.2004 | bestyrelse |
Kim Borch | 01.01.2004 | 28.10.2004 | bestyrelse |
Walther Vang Valentin | 01.01.2004 | 28.10.2004 | bestyrelse |