Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Børge Witthøft | 15.08.2007 | 31.07.2008 | adm. dir |
Klaus Melchior | 09.05.2007 | 15.08.2007 | adm. dir |
Thomas Magnussen | 06.05.2004 | 09.05.2007 | direktion |
Kurt Stokbro | 22.10.2003 | 06.05.2004 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jeremy Philip Taylor | 19.07.2007 | 07.08.2008 | bestyrelse |
Lars Dige Pedersen | 18.04.2007 | 11.01.2012 | bestyrelse |
Agner Nørgaard Mark | 18.04.2007 | 29.08.2008 | formand |
Aage Daniel Meiland | 29.05.2006 | 18.04.2007 | formand |
Mikael Heé | 08.03.2006 | 11.01.2012 | bestyrelse |
Torben Brandt Munch | 08.03.2006 | 18.04.2007 | bestyrelse |
Claus Colliander | 09.02.2005 | 28.05.2008 | bestyrelse |
Cathal John Mahon | 22.06.2004 | 11.01.2012 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Dyhrfjeld | 22.06.2004 | 29.05.2006 | formand |
Knud Erik Hald Aunsholt | 22.06.2004 | 08.03.2006 | bestyrelse |
Jeremy Philip Taylor | 22.06.2004 | 08.03.2006 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Magnussen | 06.05.2004 | 22.06.2004 | bestyrelse |
Kurt Stokbro | 22.10.2003 | 19.07.2007 | bestyrelse |