Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Michael Arne Christensen | 20.01.2010 | 16.03.2011 | direktion |
Susanne Knudsen | 29.11.2006 | 20.01.2010 | direktion |
Michael Arne Christensen | 26.02.2004 | 29.11.2006 | direktion |
Bodil Marie Christensen | 10.09.2003 | 26.02.2004 | direktion |
Tina Andersen | 10.09.2003 | 26.02.2004 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Torben Lassen | 29.11.2006 | 10.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Knudsen | 29.11.2006 | 10.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Michael Arne Christensen | 29.11.2006 | 10.04.2008 | formand |