Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Niels Boje Lund | 24.09.2004 | 15.12.2009 | adm. dir |
Joacim Lars Bruus-Jensen | 04.11.2003 | 24.09.2004 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.07.2003 | 04.11.2003 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Svein Harald Sørensen | 03.11.2008 | 15.12.2009 | bestyrelse |
Niels Jørgen Bruus-Jensen | 10.09.2007 | 15.12.2009 | bestyrelse |
Jens Storkfelt | 30.05.2007 | 03.11.2008 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Thaning | 24.03.2006 | 30.05.2007 | bestyrelse |
Joacim Lars Bruus-Jensen | 24.09.2004 | 15.12.2009 | formand |
Niels Boje Lund | 06.09.2004 | 15.12.2009 | bestyrelse |
Trine Ulrich Diamant | 04.11.2003 | 24.03.2006 | bestyrelse |
Claus Jesper Bruus-Jensen | 04.11.2003 | 06.09.2004 | bestyrelse |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.07.2003 | 04.11.2003 | bestyrelse |
Sebastian Benjamin Bahn Christoffersen | 01.07.2003 | 04.11.2003 | bestyrelse |
Helen Mimi Janniche | 01.07.2003 | 04.11.2003 | bestyrelse |