Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Svarre Røsstad | 28.07.2014 | 05.07.2016 | direktion |
Søren Brandt | 05.04.2011 | 28.07.2014 | direktion |
Mogens Stordal Pedersen | 04.08.2003 | 05.04.2011 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Hampen Christensen | 09.05.2005 | 05.07.2016 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Høy | 04.08.2003 | 05.07.2016 | bestyrelse |
Jan Svarre Røsstad | 04.08.2003 | 05.07.2016 | bestyrelse |
Bjørn Eric Paasche | 04.08.2003 | 09.05.2005 | bestyrelse |