Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Ove Krusaa | 14.12.2005 | 13.10.2009 | direktion |
Karl-Gustav Jensen | 06.08.2003 | 14.12.2005 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lena Birgitte Erichsen | 05.12.2008 | 13.10.2009 | bestyrelse |
Axel Christian Thrige Laursen | 27.02.2006 | 13.10.2009 | bestyrelse |
Winnie Larsen-Jensen | 27.02.2006 | 13.10.2009 | formand |
Karl-Gustav Jensen | 09.12.2005 | 05.12.2008 | bestyrelse |
Britta Køster | 10.01.2005 | 13.10.2009 | bestyrelse |
Jens Ole Nielsen | 06.08.2003 | 27.02.2006 | bestyrelse |
Poul Sax Møller | 06.08.2003 | 27.02.2006 | formand |
Henning Hummelmose | 06.08.2003 | 09.12.2005 | bestyrelse |
Michael Soetmann | 06.08.2003 | 10.01.2004 | bestyrelse |