Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Arne Hedegaard Larsen | 31.03.2005 | 23.08.2011 | direktion |
Kim Larsen | 27.06.2003 | 31.03.2005 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Christina Vestergaard Larsen | 10.12.2010 | 23.08.2011 | bestyrelse |
Dennis Hovaldt Hedegaard | 25.11.2010 | 23.08.2011 | bestyrelse |
Birthe Vestergaard Larsen | 25.11.2010 | 23.08.2011 | formand |
Jonna Birgitte Christensen | 20.09.2007 | 25.11.2010 | bestyrelse |
Arne Hedegaard Larsen | 27.06.2003 | 23.08.2011 | bestyrelse |
Børge Juul Kristensen | 27.06.2003 | 25.11.2010 | formand |
Jan Christensen | 27.06.2003 | 20.09.2007 | bestyrelse |
Erik Jensen | 27.06.2003 | 20.12.2006 | bestyrelse |
Kim Larsen | 27.06.2003 | 31.03.2005 | bestyrelse |