Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Michael Ole Simonsen | 22.06.2001 | 20.08.2001 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Michael Ole Simonsen | 04.09.2001 | 11.12.2003 | bestyrelse |
Ulrich Peter Simonsen | 22.06.2001 | 07.05.2010 | bestyrelse |
Kim Bang | 22.06.2001 | 07.05.2010 | formand |
Hans Peter Andersen | 22.06.2001 | 16.11.2001 | bestyrelse |
Michael Ole Simonsen | 22.06.2001 | 20.08.2001 | bestyrelse |