Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Helle Marianne Breinholt | 14.04.2010 | 22.10.2010 | bestyrelse |
Kristian Østergaard | 14.04.2010 | 22.10.2010 | formand |
Finn Christian Moefelt | 14.04.2010 | 22.10.2010 | næstformand |
Helle Bendorff | 14.04.2010 | 14.04.2010 | bestyrelse |
Lars Folman Skovby | 15.04.2009 | 14.04.2010 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Granlund | 15.04.2009 | 14.04.2010 | næstformand |
Villum Christensen | 07.04.2005 | 15.04.2009 | bestyrelse |
Ole Lyngh Jørgensen | 07.04.2005 | 15.04.2009 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Ammitzbøll | 07.04.2005 | 15.04.2009 | bestyrelse |
Ingelise Mose Bogason | 07.04.2005 | 15.04.2009 | næstformand |
Uffe Ellemann-Jensen | 07.04.2003 | 15.04.2009 | formand |
Poul Erik Christensen | 02.02.2001 | 07.04.2005 | bestyrelse |
Henning Thestrup | 02.02.2001 | 07.04.2005 | bestyrelse |
Henning Larsen | 02.02.2001 | 07.04.2005 | bestyrelse |
Per Bang Hansen | 02.02.2001 | 07.04.2005 | næstformand |
Børge Obel | 02.02.2001 | 31.03.2004 | bestyrelse |
Øyvin Bro Egelund | 02.02.2001 | 31.03.2004 | bestyrelse |
Georg Viggo Poulsen | 02.02.2001 | 07.04.2003 | formand |