Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Marlene Sparre Ibsen | 01.12.2014 | 27.03.2020 | adm. dir |
Per Meinert | 01.01.2009 | 30.11.2014 | adm. dir |
Hans Jørgen Rasmussen | 30.04.2005 | 31.12.2008 | adm. dir |
Hans Christian Svendsen | 17.04.2001 | 30.04.2005 | direktion |
Kim Madsen | 01.01.2001 | 17.04.2001 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hans Christian Kjeld Fromberg Jensen | 03.06.2013 | 27.03.2020 | bestyrelse |
Niels Aagaard Jørgensen | 30.09.2011 | 27.03.2020 | bestyrelse |
Hanne Als Palle | 01.01.2009 | 27.03.2020 | bestyrelse |
Finn Christensen | 01.01.2009 | 30.09.2011 | bestyrelse |
Karl Otto Gaarde Nielsen | 14.11.2006 | 31.12.2008 | bestyrelse |
Hans Christian Kjeld Fromberg Jensen | 14.05.2002 | 14.11.2006 | bestyrelse |
Arne Christian Jørgensen | 17.04.2001 | 03.06.2013 | bestyrelse |
Jens Erik Boesen | 17.04.2001 | 31.12.2008 | bestyrelse |
Jens Peter Risbjerg | 17.04.2001 | 14.05.2002 | bestyrelse |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 01.01.2001 | 17.04.2001 | bestyrelse |